Agents and Brokers

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0017State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education - Comparative Law CourseDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0209Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15Howard County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0442
    (SB0323)
Mechanics' Liens - Design ServicesDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0526
    (SB0673 / CH0192)
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival PermitDelegate BarkleyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0531
    (SB0429)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0576Maryland Local Stock Market and Social Stock Exchange Task ForceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0658
    (SB0344 / CH0342)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB0726Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales PresumptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1007Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on FeesDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1019
    (SB0532)
Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1028 / CH0113
    (SB0203)
Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of CommissionsDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1056 / CH0115
    (SB0610)
Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons - Continuing Education - RequirementsDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1065
    (SB0190)
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - AccommodationsDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1183 / CH0472
    (SB0649)
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New HomeDelegate KnottsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Environment and TransportationJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1236Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - Experience RequirementDelegate VaughnIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0190
    (HB1065)
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - AccommodationsSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0203
    (HB1028 / CH0113)
Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of CommissionsSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0323
    (HB0442)
Mechanics' Liens - Design ServicesSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0344 / CH0342
    (HB0658)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0429
    (HB0531)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0532
    (HB1019)
Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0610
    (HB1056 / CH0115)
Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons - Continuing Education - RequirementsSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0649
    (HB1183 / CH0472)
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New HomeSenator MuseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0673 / CH0192
    (HB0526)
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival PermitSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.