Agriculture, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0359
    (SB0280)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0381
    (SB0257)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0514 / CH0429
    (SB0258)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0633Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation PlansDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Agriculture (M4)
HB0701
    (SB0463)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0755 / CH0136
    (SB0695 / CH0135)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0803 / CH0456Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - LegalizationDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0881
    (SB0256)
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation ActDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0995Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1075
    (SB0470)
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing AnimalsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationAgriculture (M4)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0256
    (HB0881)
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation ActSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0257
    (HB0381)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0258
    (HB0514 / CH0429)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0280
    (HB0359)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0463
    (HB0701)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0470
    (HB1075)
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing AnimalsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0695 / CH0135
    (HB0755 / CH0136)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0748Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild VenisonSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0860Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Commercial FertilizerSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.