Agriculture, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0120 / CH0101Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product MarketingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0130 / CH0104Maryland Wine and Grape Promotion FundChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0417 / CH0366
    (SB0314 / CH0367)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0472 / CH0233
    (SB0416 / CH0232)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0528
    (SB0420)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0586 / CH0395
    (SB0278 / CH0396)
Maryland Farms and Families ActDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Agriculture (M4)
HB0602
    (SB0422)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Delegate RobinsonIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0626 / CH0409Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and EnforcementDelegate GilchristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0779
    (SB0719)
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017Delegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0781 / CH0343Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement RevisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0830 / CH0755
    (SB0386)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 755Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0902Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - LegalizationDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1063 / CH0373Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils ProgramDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1185
    (SB0928)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1204
    (SB0932)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine StudyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0278 / CH0396
    (HB0586 / CH0395)
Maryland Farms and Families ActSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0314 / CH0367
    (HB0417 / CH0366)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0386
    (HB0830 / CH0755)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0416 / CH0232
    (HB0472 / CH0233)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 232Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0420
    (HB0528)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017Senator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0422
    (HB0602)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0719
    (HB0779)
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017Senator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0730Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - FarmersSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0928
    (HB1185)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0932
    (HB1204)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine StudySenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 25, 2017 12:52 P.M.