Aircraft

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0238Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air NavigationDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0400State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected OfficialsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0620Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized SurveillanceDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HJ0007
    (SJ0006)
Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and SpacecraftDelegate AdamsIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0370 / CH0164Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0899Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and ApprovalSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SJ0006
    (HJ0007)
Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and SpacecraftSenator MathiasIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.