Aliens and Citizenship

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0211Public Safety - Handgun Permits - QualificationsDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0317State Government - E-Verify ProgramDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0361 / CH0368Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0476
    (SB0720)
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail BondsDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0739Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - ReportingDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Higher Education (F2)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Delegate IveyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0871Education - Dually Enrolled Students - In-State and In-County TuitionDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0307Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013Senator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0715 / CH0309
    (HB0789)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Senator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0720
    (HB0476)
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail BondsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.