Allegany County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0254 / CH0092Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before ReleaseAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0255 / CH0093Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0449
    (SB0393)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care CenterAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0463
    (SB0440)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilityAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0467 / CH0118Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit DurationAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0816 / CH0070
    (SB0629 / CH0069)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1362
    (SB0927)
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - RepealAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1517
    (SB1036)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Allegany County - Cumberland City MarketDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0393
    (HB0449)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care CenterSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0440
    (HB0463)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilitySenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0629 / CH0069
    (HB0816 / CH0070)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0917 / CH0580Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0927
    (HB1362)
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - RepealSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1036
    (HB1517)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Allegany County - Cumberland City MarketSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.