Allegany County

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0526
    (SB0747)
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0543
    (SB0483 / CH0069)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve LiquorAllegany County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0560
    (SB0349)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany and Garrett Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0577
    (SB0431 / CH0206)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing DateAllegany County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Generally (L1)
HB0742Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0755
    (SB0524)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Black Bears - BaitingAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0766 / CH0117Natural Resources - Fish and FisheriesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0987
    (SB0900)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove StatueAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0994 / CH0286
    (SB0736)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Class A LicensesAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 286Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0995 / CH0589
    (SB0878 / CH0588)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1167 / CH0503
    (SB0680)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1168 / CH0504
    (SB0681)
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1538
    (SB1044)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation ProjectAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1539
    (SB1045)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilityAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1540
    (SB1025)
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership CostsAllegany County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsGaming (C7)
SB0349
    (HB0560)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany, Carroll, Cecil, Garrett, and Harford Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0431 / CH0206
    (HB0577)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing DateSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Generally (L1)
SB0483 / CH0069
    (HB0543)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve LiquorSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0524
    (HB0755)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Black Bears - BaitingSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0680
    (HB1167 / CH0503)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0681
    (HB1168 / CH0504)
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0728
    (HB1143)
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler SystemsSenator MathiasIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0736
    (HB0994 / CH0286)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Class A LicensesSenator EdwardsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0747
    (HB0526)
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0878 / CH0588
    (HB0995 / CH0589)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0900
    (HB0987)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove StatueSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1025
    (HB1540)
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership CostsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1044
    (HB1538)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation ProjectSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1045
    (HB1539)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilitySenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1061Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRulesHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.