Allegany County

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0287 / CH0306
    (SB0461 / CH0305)
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0720 / CH0167
    (SB0486 / CH0168)
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension FormulaAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0722 / CH0165
    (SB0644 / CH0166)
Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and SnowmobilesAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0724
    (SB0604)
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to DealerWestern Maryland DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0911
    (SB0717)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Camp PotomacAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1067
    (SB0716)
Creation of a State Debt – Allegany County – Frostburg Museum Relocation ProjectAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1068 / CH0163
    (SB0645 / CH0164)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) LicenseAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1122
    (SB0959)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black BearsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0461 / CH0305
    (HB0287 / CH0306)
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of ProhibitionSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 305Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0486 / CH0168
    (HB0720 / CH0167)
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension FormulaSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0604
    (HB0724)
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to DealerSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0644 / CH0166
    (HB0722 / CH0165)
Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and SnowmobilesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 166Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0645 / CH0164
    (HB1068 / CH0163)
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) LicenseSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0716
    (HB1067)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation ProjectSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0717
    (HB0911)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Camp PotomacSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0959
    (HB1122)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black BearsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 27, 2018 1:12 P.M.