Alternative Dispute Resolution

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0932 / CH0566
    (SB0832 / CH0565)
Child Care - Dispute ResolutionDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1141Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1215 / CH0408Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - StudyDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0832 / CH0565
    (HB0932 / CH0566)
Child Care - Dispute ResolutionSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.