Alternative Dispute Resolution

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0077 / CH0346
    (SB0258 / CH0347)
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain ProvisionsDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0256Prince George's County - Landlord-Tenant Cases - Alternative Dispute Resolution Program PG 409-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1158
    (SB1209)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0258 / CH0347
    (HB0077 / CH0346)
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain ProvisionsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:22 P.M.