Alternative Energy Sources

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0103 / CH0217
    (SB0245 / CH0216)
School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development DocumentsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0504
    (SB0370 / CH0463)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0621 / CH0625
    (SB0627)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0800
    (SB0524 / CH0492)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0817Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power SourcesDelegate MurphyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1084 / CH0323
    (SB0797 / CH0322)
Thermal Energy - Task Force and RegulationsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1091
    (SB0796)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesDelegate JamesonIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1102
    (SB0684)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1128
    (SB0699)
Electricity - Community Energy-Generating Facilities - Pilot ProgramDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1173Small Business Energy Assistance ActDelegate KramerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1187
    (SB0887 / CH0572)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1198Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy SystemsDelegate MyersIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1428Public Utilities - Geothermal Heating and Cooling On-Bill Financing - Pilot ProgramDelegate HuckerIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1534 / CH0342
    (SB1064 / CH0341)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Solar Water Heating SystemsDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Economic MattersFinance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0136Solar Energy Grant Program - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners AssociationsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
1/30/2013 - 2:45 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0245 / CH0216
    (HB0103 / CH0217)
School Buildings - Solar Technology - Design Development DocumentsSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0370 / CH0463
    (HB0504)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0524 / CH0492
    (HB0800)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0627
    (HB0621 / CH0625)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramSenator RamirezIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0684
    (HB1102)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassSenator GaragiolaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0689Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power SourcesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0699
    (HB1128)
Electricity - Community Energy-Generating Facilities - Pilot ProgramSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0796
    (HB1091)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Agriculture (M4)
SB0797 / CH0322
    (HB1084 / CH0323)
Thermal Energy - Task Force and RegulationsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0887 / CH0572
    (HB1187)
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic SystemsSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0974Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Repeal of Solar Energy RequirementSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0976Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Renewable Sources - Qualifying Natural GasSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1016Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FroshIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB1022Prince George's County - Green Business ZonesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1064 / CH0341
    (HB1534 / CH0342)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Solar Water Heating SystemsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.