Alternative Energy Sources

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0202 / CH0473
    (SB0186 / CH0472)
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Economic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0468Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund - Training and Technology ProjectsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0473
    (SB0787)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0738
    (SB0493)
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's FutureDelegate BranchIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0747
    (SB0734)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0861
    (SB0259 / CH0287)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Agriculture (M4)
HB0931
    (SB0530)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1076
    (SB0521)
Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory CommitteeDelegate ConwayIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Agriculture (M4)
HB1149
    (SB0733)
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio StandardsDelegate BarnesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1168Electricity - Certificate - Wind Turbines - LimitationSouthern Maryland DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1192
    (SB0786)
Electricity - Community Renewable Energy Generating System - Pilot ProgramDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1249
    (SB0156)
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydrokinetic TurbinesDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1463
    (SB1020)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0002 / CH0466Garrett County - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems - Setback RequirementSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 466Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0156
    (HB1249)
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydrokinetic TurbinesSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0186 / CH0472
    (HB0202 / CH0473)
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0259 / CH0287
    (HB0861)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters Agriculture (M4)
SB0493
    (HB0738)
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's FutureSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0521
    (HB1076)
Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative ProgramSenator PinskyIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters Agriculture (M4)
SB0530
    (HB0931)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0733
    (HB1149)
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio StandardsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0734
    (HB0747)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0786
    (HB1192)
Electricity - Community Renewable Energy Generating System - Pilot ProgramSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0787
    (HB0473)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0932Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy SystemsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0985 / CH0365Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - StudySenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1020
    (HB1463)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1021Net Energy Metering - Industrial Combined Heat and PowerSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.