Alternative Energy Sources

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0105 / CH0535
    (SB0173 / CH0534)
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Commercial Property Owners - Renewable Energy ProjectsDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0362Department of Veterans Affairs - Study of Solar Photovoltaic System - Charlotte Hall Veterans HomeDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0387 / CH0593
    (SB0912 / CH0592)
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - StudyDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 593Economic Matters
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0440 / CH0431
    (SB0811 / CH0430)
Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - Completion of InterconnectionDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Economic Matters
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0471
    (SB0622)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0705
    (SB0726 / CH0577)
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Clean Energy Technology FundingDelegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1070
    (SB0809)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertyDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1145
    (SB0936 / CH0594)
Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act of 2016Delegate TurnerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1276Electric Universal Service Program - Solar Procurement StudyDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1287
    (SB0867)
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible SourcesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1412Real Property - New Residential Property - Information on Renewable Energy AlternativesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1599Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Solar Collector SystemsDelegate BrooksIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0105Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and AuthorityChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0168Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0173 / CH0534
    (HB0105 / CH0535)
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Commercial Property Owners - Renewable Energy ProjectsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 534Finance
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0454Sales and Use Tax - Manufacturing Businesses - Exemption for Energy CostsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0622
    (HB0471)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0726 / CH0577
    (HB0705)
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Task ForceSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 577Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0809
    (HB1070)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0811 / CH0430
    (HB0440 / CH0431)
Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - Completion of InterconnectionSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0867
    (HB1287)
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible SourcesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0912 / CH0592
    (HB0387 / CH0593)
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - StudySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 592Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0936 / CH0594
    (HB1145)
Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act of 2016Senator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.