Alternative Energy Sources

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0410 / CH0364
    (SB0313 / CH0365)
Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation InstituteSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0442Volkswagen Settlement Funds - Use of Environmental Mitigation TrustDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0514
    (SB0184 / CH0014)
Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-EffectivenessDelegate JamesonIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0699
    (SB0301)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0863State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm)Delegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0867Natural Resources - State-Owned Land - Wind FacilitiesDelegate BarveIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0970Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1395Solar Energy Grant Program - Energy StorageDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1414 / CH0393
    (SB1146)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - StudyDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1457Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - RevisionsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1512
    (SB0942)
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - EstablishmentDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1543Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Installing Solar Panels on Baltimore City Public SchoolsDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1548
    (SB0926)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertyDelegate EbersoleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0174Income Tax Credit - Clean Energy Production - Qualified Energy Resources (Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act)Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0301
    (HB0699)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0313 / CH0365
    (HB0410 / CH0364)
Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation InstitutePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0926
    (HB1548)
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy PropertySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0942
    (HB1512)
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - EstablishmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0980
    (HB1461)
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution FundSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1146
    (HB1414 / CH0393)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - StudySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1158 / CH0372Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly DesignationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 372Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 10:57 A.M.