Alternative Energy Sources

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0019Solar Energy Grant Program - Minimum Grant AmountsDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0424Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Anacostia River Trail - Solar Lighting Study PG/MC 114-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0529
    (SB0282)
Renewable Energy – Tier 2 Eligibility – ExtensionDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0602Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0714 / CH0679
    (SB0751 / CH0678)
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid VehiclesDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 679Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0866Maryland Energy Administration - Study on Location of Solar Photovoltaic TechnologiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0878Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018)Delegate RobinsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0934
    (SB0557)
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar EnergyDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0967
    (SB0391)
Ratepayer Reduction for Renewable Energy ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1013
    (SB0759)
Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar FarmsDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1135
    (SB1058)
Renewable Energy - Offshore Wind Projects - Distance RequirementsDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1236
    (SB0879)
Solar Energy Grant Program - RevisionsDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1242Solar Photovoltaic RecyclingDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1301Income Tax Credits – Poultry Houses – LED LightingDelegate AndertonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1398State Boat Act - Solar Reflective Lights on Buoys - RequirementDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1453
    (SB0732)
Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2018Delegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1481 / CH0680
    (SB0648 / CH0681)
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 680Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1486Public Safety - Solar Photovoltaic Systems - Lockout Tag RequirementDelegate McComasIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1528 / CH0696
    (SB1117 / CH0697)
Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage PreventionDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 696Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1573 / CH0245Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or TransferDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Economic Matters
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1591Solar Facilities - Siting StandardsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1631Commercial Solar Facilities - Vicinity TariffDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1653Solar Electric Generating Facility Decommissioning and Restoration - Security - FundDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1688
    (SB0761)
Public Utilities - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Exclusion From ExemptionDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1692
    (SB0760)
Land Use - Solar Electric Generating Facility Siting - Prohibition on Contiguous Parcels of Agricultural LandDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0282
    (HB0529)
Renewable Energy – Tiers 1 and 2 Sources – Modifications and Compliance FeeSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0391
    (HB0967)
Electric Companies - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Requirements - Standard Offer ServiceSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0433 / CH0456Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - ReportingSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Finance
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0557
    (HB0934)
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar EnergySenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0603Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standards - SourcesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0648 / CH0681
    (HB1481 / CH0680)
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0732
    (HB1453)
Renewable Energy and Job DevelopmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0751 / CH0678
    (HB0714 / CH0679)
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid VehiclesSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0759
    (HB1013)
Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar FarmsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0760
    (HB1692)
Land Use - Solar Electric Generating Facility Siting - Prohibition on Contiguous Parcels of Agricultural LandSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0761
    (HB1688)
Public Utilities - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Exclusion From ExemptionSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0879
    (HB1236)
Solar Energy Grant Program - RevisionsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1058
    (HB1135)
Renewable Energy – Offshore Wind Projects – Distance RequirementsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1117 / CH0697
    (HB1528 / CH0696)
Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage PreventionSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 697Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:10 P.M.