Ambulances

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0368 / CH0360
    (SB0214)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0562 / CH0434
    (SB0869)
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0898Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0948
    (SB0473)
Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding AllocationDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1103Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - ApprovalDelegate HayesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1219Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyCecil County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0214
    (HB0368 / CH0360)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0473
    (HB0948)
Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding AllocationSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0546 / CH0359Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0869
    (HB0562 / CH0434)
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination DateSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.