Animal Shelters

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0565Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and RemovalDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0732
    (SB0675)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0835
    (SB0941)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Baltimore County Animal ServicesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0980
    (SB0700)
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal RefugeDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1662Business Regulation – Retail Pet StoresDelegate KramerIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0675
    (HB0732)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Senator HoughIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0700
    (HB0980)
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal RefugeSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0941
    (HB0835)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Baltimore County Animal ServicesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

April 10, 2018 4:09 P.M.