Annapolis

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0082Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Shiplap HouseDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB0084
    (SB0110)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House RestorationDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0094Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's MuseumDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB0145 / CH0215
    (SB0244 / CH0214)
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container LicenseAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0766 / CH0139Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - CertificationDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1305 / CH0675City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency RequirementAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 675Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1358
    (SB0663)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee ProjectDelegate LoveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1458
    (SB0999)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's StreetDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0091Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Shiplap HouseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0092Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Sprinkler Assistance Revolving FundSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0110
    (HB0084)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House RestorationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0244 / CH0214
    (HB0145 / CH0215)
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container LicenseSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 214Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0663
    (HB1358)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee ProjectSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0999
    (HB1458)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's StreetSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.