Annotated Code of Maryland

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0251
    (SB0785)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0562Vehicle Laws - Single Registration PlateDelegate ElliottIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0660
    (SB0827)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Delegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0733 / CH0136Local Government - Cross-References and CorrectionsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Delegate IveyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1253
    (SB0662 / CH0519)
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - LicensingDelegate JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0283 / CH0042Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0284 / CH0043Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0662 / CH0519
    (HB1253)
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - LicensingSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0664Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0785
    (HB0251)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0827
    (HB0660)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Senator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.