Annotated Code of Maryland

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0878Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018)Delegate RobinsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1430Health Occupations - Podiatric PhysiciansDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0012Motor Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Single Registration Plate RequirementSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0065Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0811 / CH0011Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11RulesRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0812 / CH0012Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12RulesRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2018 1:39 P.M.