Apartments

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0469
    (SB0018)
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Delegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0511Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - ExemptionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0676Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0677 / CH0135Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1050
    (SB0221)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior ApartmentsDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1279 / CH0410
    (SB0902)
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - EnforcementDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1413 / CH0595
    (SB0969 / CH0594)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1433 / CH0685Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 685Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0018
    (HB0469)
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0221
    (HB1050)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior ApartmentsSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0625Real Property - Dwellings Rented to Individuals at Least 55 Years Old - Air-Conditioning SystemsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0902
    (HB1279 / CH0410)
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - EnforcementSenator MuseIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental MattersPublic Safety (E4)
SB0969 / CH0594
    (HB1413 / CH0595)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1049 / CH0602Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean CitySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.