Appraisals

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0796
    (SB0427)
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real PropertyDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1097
    (SB0397)
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of FeesDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersReal Property (N1)
SB0397
    (HB1097)
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of FeesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0427
    (HB0796)
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real PropertySenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.