Apprentices

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0370
    (SB0777)
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship ProgramsDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0499State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing - Hair Braiders, Cosmetology Assistants, and MicrodermabrasionDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0538
    (SB0075)
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0587 / CH0262State Board of Barbers - Limited License - Barber-StylistDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0942 / CH0140
    (SB0772)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1048Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education - LicensingDelegate GilchristIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1124State Board of Cosmetology - Natural Hair Care Stylist - LicensureDelegate SmithIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1226 / CH0120Apprenticeship and Training - Replacement of Obsolete ReferencesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0075
    (HB0538)
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0616Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0772
    (HB0942 / CH0140)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0777
    (HB0370)
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship ProgramsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0907Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction ProjectsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledFinance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.