Apprentices

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0108
    (SB0457)
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship RequirementsDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/3/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
HB0290 / CH0404
    (SB0545 / CH0403)
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - EstablishmentDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Economic Matters
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0676 / CH0495Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council - Annual ReportDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Economic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0999 / CH0702
    (SB0905 / CH0701)
Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationDelegate KaiserEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1187
    (SB0922)
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016Delegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1223Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - EstablishmentDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1615
    (SB1126 / CH0470)
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High SchoolDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0007Prevailing Wage Law - Applicability - Elementary and Secondary School ConstructionSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0092 / CH0343Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0273Income Tax Credit - Apprenticeship and Training - Work-Based Learning ProgramSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0457
    (HB0108)
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship RequirementsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Budget and Taxation
Capital Budget (B5)
SB0545 / CH0403
    (HB0290 / CH0404)
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - EstablishmentSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0905 / CH0701
    (HB0999 / CH0702)
Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0922
    (HB1187)
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016Senator RosapepeIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansFinance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1126 / CH0470
    (HB1615)
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High SchoolSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.