Apprentices

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0431 / CH0379
    (SB0308 / CH0380)
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0490
    (SB0163 / CH0441)
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and CertificationDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0527 / CH0364Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - AlterationsDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0976
    (SB0261)
Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition AssistanceDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1107 / CH0337
    (SB0831)
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship ProgramDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1216 / CH0694
    (SB0978 / CH0695)
Career Preparation Expansion ActDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 694Economic Matters
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Higher Education (F2)
HB1226
    (SB0517)
Career Apprenticeship Investment ActDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1234 / CH0403
    (SB0618)
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship ActDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1415 / CH0361
    (SB1092)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1599
    (SB0949)
Career Education Policy ActDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1753
    (SB0776)
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship ProgramDelegate GlennIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
SB0163 / CH0441
    (HB0490)
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and CertificationSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0261
    (HB0976)
Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition AssistanceSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0308 / CH0380
    (HB0431 / CH0379)
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0517
    (HB1226)
Career Apprenticeship Investment ActSenator RosapepeIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Economic Matters
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0618
    (HB1234 / CH0403)
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship ActSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0776
    (HB1753)
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship ProgramSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0831
    (HB1107 / CH0337)
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship ProgramSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0949
    (HB1599)
Career Education Policy ActSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0978 / CH0695
    (HB1216 / CH0694)
Career Preparation Expansion ActSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 695Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.