Arbitration

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0667
    (SB0553)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0760Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - AlterationsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0795Maryland Environmental Service - Collective BargainingDelegate Young, P.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0869
    (SB0574)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0992Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - RepealDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1159
    (SB0773)
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - RestrictionsSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1170
    (SB0250)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1228
    (SB0832)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0250
    (HB1170)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0363Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0390 / CH0669
    (HB0505 / CH0670)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0447Maryland Environmental Service - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0553
    (HB0667)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0574
    (HB0869)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0773
    (HB1159)
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - RestrictionsPresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0832
    (HB1228)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.