Arbitration

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0077 / CH0346
    (SB0258 / CH0347)
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain ProvisionsDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0278 / CH0127Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0667
    (SB0408)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1758
    (SB0639 / CH0013)
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing ProceduresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0258 / CH0347
    (HB0077 / CH0346)
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain ProvisionsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0408
    (HB0667)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceHigher Education (F2)
SB0639 / CH0013
    (HB1758)
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing ProceduresSenator GuzzoneGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 27, 2018 1:14 P.M.