Architects

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0534
    (SB0438)
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United StatesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0757 / CH0138Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Reporting of Architectural Services and Engineering Services ContractsDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0179Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm PermitsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0438
    (HB0534)
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United StatesSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.