Architects

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0188 / CH0045
    (SB0077 / CH0046)
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - MembershipChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0958
    (SB0962)
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional ServicesDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1557 / CH0633
    (SB1020 / CH0634)
Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal PreferenceDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Health and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0077 / CH0046
    (HB0188 / CH0045)
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - MembershipChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0962
    (HB0958)
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional ServicesSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1020 / CH0634
    (HB1557 / CH0633)
Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal PreferenceSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:05 P.M.