Archives

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0413 / CH0265Maryland General Assembly - Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video StreamingDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 265Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0492
    (SB0155)
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - RequirementsDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1261State Archivist - Process for Evaluating State DesignationsDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0049
    (HB0215)
Maryland State Song - RevisionSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0155
    (HB0492)
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - RequirementsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0467General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.