Archives

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0078 / CH0552
    (SB0516)
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)Delegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0148 / CH0111State Archives - Care of Fine Art or Decorative Art - Procurement ExemptionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0165 / CH0553
    (SB0137 / CH0554)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0169
    (SB0091)
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)Delegate KormanIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0438
    (SB0253)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1241Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - RequirementsDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0044 / CH0539Records Management and Preservation - State Units and Public Officials - ResponsibilitiesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 539Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0091
    (HB0169)
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)Senator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0137 / CH0554
    (HB0165 / CH0553)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0253
    (HB0438)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0516
    (HB0078 / CH0552)
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)Senator ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.