Arrests

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0150Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)Delegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0254 / CH0092Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before ReleaseAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0292 / CH0431Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of SunsetChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0558Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0596 / CH0622
    (SB0419)
Civil Actions - Interrogatories or Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear to Show CauseDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0597
    (SB0418)
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to AppearDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0627
    (SB0850)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1088 / CH0146Business Regulation - Returnable Containers and Returnable Textiles - RevisionsDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1220 / CH0409Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear DesignationDelegate SwainApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1360
    (SB0243 / CH0213)
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County Warrant Intercept Program - ExtensionDelegate GeorgeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0243 / CH0213
    (HB1360)
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County Warrant Intercept Program - ExtensionSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 213Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0418
    (HB0597)
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to AppearSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0419
    (HB0596 / CH0622)
Civil Actions - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to AppearSenator FroshIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0850
    (HB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1069Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator ShankIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.