Arrests

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0920
    (SB0705)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0942Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential TenancyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Real Property (N1)
HB1289Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder ScreeningsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1461Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act)Delegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1803
    (SB1241)
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police ForceDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0705
    (HB0920)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1034Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest WarrantSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1241
    (HB1803)
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police ForceSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudicial Proceedings
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 27, 2018 1:04 P.M.