Art, Music and Cultural Affairs

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0060Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Jewelry CenterDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0094
    (SB0051 / CH0145)
Commission on African American History and Culture - DutiesDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0130
    (SB0601 / CH0371)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsDelegate JonesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
HB0136Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland CarouselCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0137 / CH0492Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - License FeesCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0254
    (SB0872)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company's Downtown Theater and Educational AnnexDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0295
    (SB0176)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - F. Scott Fitzgerald Theatre and Social HallDelegate GilchristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0331Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0332
    (SB0263)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Arts CenterDelegate CareyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0334Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Ladew Topiary GardensHarford County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0394
    (SB0024)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Weinberg Center HVAC ProjectDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0544 / CH0259Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle ClubsCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0670
    (SB0700)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket TransfersDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0688
    (SB0149)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1004
    (SB0313)
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Individuals at Special Entertainment Events PG 319-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing cancelledEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1201
    (SB0830)
Health Occupations - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Provisional LicensesDelegate HayesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1240
    (SB0902 / CH0205)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages LicensesFrederick County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1242
    (SB0240)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - The Writer's CenterDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0024
    (HB0394)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Weinberg Center HVAC ProjectSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0051 / CH0145
    (HB0094)
Commission on African American History and Culture - DutiesSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 145Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0149
    (HB0688)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0176
    (HB0295)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - F. Scott Fitzgerald Theatre and Social HallSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0240
    (HB1242)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - The Writer's CenterSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0263
    (HB0332)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Arts CenterSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0313
    (HB1004)
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Individuals at Special Entertainment Events in the 47th Legislative DistrictSenator RamirezIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0361Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle ClubsCalvert County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0601 / CH0371
    (HB0130)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
SB0700
    (HB0670)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket TransfersSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0830
    (HB1201)
Health Occupations - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Provisional LicensesSenator ConwayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0872
    (HB0254)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company's Downtown Theater and Educational AnnexSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0902 / CH0205
    (HB1240)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages LicensesSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0922 / CH0210
    (HB1271)
City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals and Street Festival LicensesSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 210Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.