Art, Music and Cultural Affairs

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0093
    (SB0146)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Maryland Hall for the Creative ArtsDelegate BuschIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0161
    (SB0187)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0262Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Maryland Art PlaceDelegate HayesIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0274
    (SB0231)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare CompanyDelegate EbersoleIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0338
    (SB0641)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Public Arts Project Ho. Co. 2–18Howard County DelegationIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0471Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Permit - Exception PG 304-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0530Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the ArtsCharles County DelegationIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0742
    (SB0552)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0826
    (SB0503)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioFrederick County DelegationIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0840Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - American Visionary Art MuseumDelegate ClippingerIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0872Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Creative AllianceDelegate ClippingerIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0996Homeschool Students in Maryland - Extracurricular ActivitiesDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1033
    (SB0917)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Pratt Street and Howard Street PlazaDelegate LiermanIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1198
    (SB1112)
Creation of a State Debt – Baltimore City – The CompoundDelegate Washington, M.In the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1279
    (SB0797)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center for the ArtsDelegate KaiserIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1291
    (SB0679)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Arts on the Block Studio ExpansionDelegate HixsonIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1325Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C License and Class C and D Per Diem Entertainment Venue License Ho. Co. 20–18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1401Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2018Delegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1433Prince George’s County – Artwork at Purple Line Transit Stations – Local Approval PG 431–18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1471Workgroup to Study Design Industry Impacts in MarylandDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1694
    (SB1095)
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - The Maryland TheatreDelegate CordermanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1709
    (SB1110)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre ExpansionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0146
    (HB0093)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Maryland Hall for the Creative ArtsSenator AstleIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0187
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0231
    (HB0274)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare CompanySenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0503
    (HB0826)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith StudioSenator HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0552
    (HB0742)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0641
    (HB0338)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Public Arts Project Ho. Co. 2-18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0679
    (HB1291)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Arts on the Block Studio ExpansionSenator SmithIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0790Maryland State Song - Repeal and Replace - State Selection PanelSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0797
    (HB1279)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center for the ArtsSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0824Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Arts Realty Corporation Building RenovationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0917
    (HB1033)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Pratt Street and Howard Street PlazaSenator FergusonIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0983Maryland Historical Society - FundingSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1095
    (HB1694)
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - The Maryland TheatreSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1110
    (HB1709)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre ExpansionSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1112
    (HB1198)
Creation of a State Debt – Baltimore City – The BARCO CompoundSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1157Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland CarouselSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

February 17, 2018 12:12 P.M.