Assault

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0200Criminal Law - First Degree Assault - StrangulationDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0221Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited ActionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0477Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0688Criminal Law - Assault Against a Transit Vehicle OperatorDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0700Criminal Law - Assault Against a Transit Vehicle PassengerDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0853
    (SB0417)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0854 / CH0643
    (SB0479)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally ResponsibleDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 643Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1185Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Health Care PractitionersDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0417
    (HB0853)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0479
    (HB0854 / CH0643)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally ResponsibleSenator GladdenIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.