Assault

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0022Baltimore City - Prohibition on Ordinance Eliminating or Limiting Duty to RetreatDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary Counties - Generally (L1)
HB0067Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Duty to RetreatDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0090Regulated Firearms - Disqualifying Crime - Domestically Related CrimeDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0125Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited ActionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0185
    (SB0683)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0214Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Immunity for Use of Physical Force in Defense of DwellingDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0306 / CH0116
    (SB0337 / CH0115)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0309 / CH0114
    (SB0334 / CH0113)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0312
    (SB0264)
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - ProhibitionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0622Criminal Law - First Degree Assault - StrangulationDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0710
    (SB0483 / CH0510)
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety ProgramDelegate CullisonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1183
    (SB0797)
Criminal Law - Assault - First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1185Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend PropertyDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1186Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2014 - 3:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0264
    (HB0312)
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - ProhibitionBaltimore City SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0334 / CH0113
    (HB0309 / CH0114)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0337 / CH0115
    (HB0306 / CH0116)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0483 / CH0510
    (HB0710)
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0683
    (HB0185)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0797
    (HB1183)
Criminal Law - Assault - First RespondersSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.