Assault

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0255 / CH0159
    (SB0349 / CH0158)
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and NotificationDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0260
    (SB0780)
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local AuditsDelegate QueenIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsAppropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0484
    (SB0861)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0836 / CH0703Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law BatteryDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 703Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1258Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - EducatorsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0349 / CH0158
    (HB0255 / CH0159)
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and NotificationSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0780
    (HB0260)
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local AuditsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0861
    (HB0484)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsSenator SmithIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1154Criminal Law - Assault by Strangulation or Suffocation - PenaltiesSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:34 A.M.