Assault

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0028Criminal Law - Assault - Public Transportation Operator and PenaltiesDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0312 / CH0619Criminal Law – School Bus Driver and Public Transportation Worker – Obstructing, Hindering, or Interfering WithDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0488Criminal Law - Third-Degree AssaultDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0683Criminal Law - Assault of Public Transportation Operator - PenaltiesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0713
    (SB1027)
Higher Education - Transfer Student Education Records - RequirementsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0913 / CH0395
    (SB0607 / CH0394)
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings ProvisionsDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1128
    (SB0736)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)Delegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1305Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - EducatorsDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1529
    (SB1100)
Criminal Law - Assault - Sentencing (Violence Prevention Education Act)Delegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1570Criminal Law - Assault on an Elder Adult - PenaltiesDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0607 / CH0394
    (HB0913 / CH0395)
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings ProvisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0725 / CH0366Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School ResponseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0736
    (HB1128)
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1027
    (HB0713)
Higher Education - Transfer Student Education Records - RequirementsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1100
    (HB1529)
Criminal Law - Assault - Sentencing (Violence Prevention Education Act)Senator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:03 P.M.