Assessments

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0021
    (SB0119)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m.Ways and Means
1/16/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0023
    (SB0176)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special AssessmentsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0235 / CH0361Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - DatabaseDelegate McComasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0286 / CH0449
    (SB0161 / CH0448)
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0527 / CH0375
    (SB0522)
Frederick Regional Higher Education Advisory BoardDelegate ClagettApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0549
    (SB0145)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0653 / CH0631Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of ViolationsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0803 / CH0390Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax CreditChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0822
    (SB0656 / CH0516)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilityCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0833
    (SB0740 / CH0533)
College Readiness and Completion Act of 2013Delegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0888Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals ProcessDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1030 / CH0660Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - DefinitionDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 660Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1174Educator Evaluation System - Pilot Program ExtensionDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1176 / CH0471
    (SB0461 / CH0470)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilityDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1274Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013Delegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1322Transportation Infrastructure BankDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1327 / CH0151Agricultural Commodity - Assessment - CollectionDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1330 / CH0676Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer ComplianceChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0119
    (HB0021)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0145
    (HB0549)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0161 / CH0448
    (HB0286 / CH0449)
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 448Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0176
    (HB0023)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special AssessmentsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0251Personal Property Tax - Depreciation of Assessed ValueSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0461 / CH0470
    (HB1176 / CH0471)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilitySenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0522
    (HB0527 / CH0375)
Frederick Regional Higher Education Advisory BoardSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0656 / CH0516
    (HB0822)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilitySenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0740 / CH0533
    (HB0833)
College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013Senator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0775Education - Model Performance Evaluation Criteria - ImplementationSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0906Transportation - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0926 / CH0581Education - State and Local Aid Program for Certification or Renewal of Certification - Sunset RepealSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 581Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1071Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness InitiativePrince George's County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.