Assessments and Taxation, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0041Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide RegistrationDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/24/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0044 / CH0542Residential Property - Ground Lease Registration Forms - Contact Information OptionDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 542Environment and Transportation
1/24/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0045Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required RedemptionDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0215County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax ExemptionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0247Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0268Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - ExemptionDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0346 / CH0118Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers MC 1-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0351 / CH0239Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Credit Percentage and Constant Yield Tax Rate - DeadlinesDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0510Property Tax - Assessments and Valuations of Real Property - AppealsDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0688
    (SB0407)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living AdjustmentDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0691Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Filing Fee Fairness Act of 2017)Delegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0714
    (SB0656)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution - RepealDelegate ClarkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0744 / CH0674
    (SB0481)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0751Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit SupplementDelegate LongIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0872Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development ProjectsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0979 / CH0686Property Tax Credit - Public Safety OfficersDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 686Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1184Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1190Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - FeesDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1238Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal PropertyDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1249Corporations and Associations - Domestications - AuthorizationDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1260Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and AffidavitDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1367Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1394 / CH0529Property Tax - Reassessment After AppealDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1402 / CH0530Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline and NoticeDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1472
    (SB0985)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 65 Years OldDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0172
    (HB0152 / CH0023)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0273 / CH0692State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity ProgramSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 692Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0357
    (HB0615)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0407
    (HB0688)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living AdjustmentSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0481
    (HB0744 / CH0674)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0985
    (HB1472)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 65 Years OldSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.