Assessments and Taxation, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018
    (SB0993)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealDelegate ClarkIn the House - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0089Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - AdministrationChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0161
    (SB0187)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0208Prince George's County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit Supplement PG 407-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0254Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful CollectionsChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0305
    (SB0158)
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility AwarenessDelegate TarlauIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0374Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal PropertyDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0380Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0459Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License FeesDelegate CarrIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsEconomic Matters
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0566
    (SB0195)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2018Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0583
    (SB0815)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit SupplementDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0763Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration StatusDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0873
    (SB0659)
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of StockDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0989
    (SB0877)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0990Homestead Property Tax Credit - Notification on Acquisition of PropertyDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1093Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording ActDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1241
    (SB0971)
Corporations and Associations - Recordation and Filing - Proof of Occupational or Professional License or Admission to BarDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1340Property Tax - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of AgreementsDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1371Recordation Tax - Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation - DistributionDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1510Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual ReportDelegate MautzIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1660Property Tax - Reassessment After Appeal - ApplicationDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1666Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2018Delegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1669
    (SB0599)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 70 Years OldDelegate JalisiIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0009Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - RepealChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0010Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of PropertySenator KasemeyerIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0070Corporations – Limited Liability Companies – Member–Trustees – EstablishmentSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0084Real Property Tax - Exemption Applications - Approval AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0098Property Tax - Public Utilities - Assessment ApportionmentChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0158
    (HB0305)
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility AwarenessSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0187
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0195
    (HB0566)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2018Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0599
    (HB1669)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 70 Years OldSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0659
    (HB0873)
Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of StockSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0815
    (HB0583)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit SupplementSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0877
    (HB0989)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0971
    (HB1241)
Corporations and Associations – Recordation and Filing – Proof of Occupational or Professional LicenseSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0993
    (HB0018)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB1001Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program - RevisionsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1053Public Safety - 9-1-1 Public Safety Telecommunicators - BenefitsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

February 19, 2018 3:47 P.M.