Assisted Living

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0511Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - ExemptionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1159 / CH0670Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs FacilitiesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 670Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1267Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1310
    (SB0834)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1504
    (SB1034)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Baltimore City - Assisted Living on the GreenDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1034
    (HB1504)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Baltimore City - Assisted Living on the GreenSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.