Assisted Living

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0100 / CH0381Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0271
    (SB0276)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0395
    (SB0702)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0532
    (SB0432)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Database of Direct Access Employees - EstablishmentDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0590 / CH0413Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and RepealChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0594
    (SB0762)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational CenterDelegate EckardtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0846Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care ServicesDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0900
    (SB0663)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest HouseDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2014 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1072Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1272Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security FreezesDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1380
    (SB1014)
Developmental Disabilities - Residential Programs - Reimbursement for Visitation Absence DaysDelegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1500
    (SB0680)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Epiphany House and Micah House ProjectsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1511Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check ProgramChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1550
    (SB1109)
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Cedar Lane Senior Living Community Project - Phase 4Delegate WoodIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0013Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory CommitteeChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0276
    (HB0271)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0432
    (HB0532)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Plan for Creation and Implementation of a Database of Direct Access EmployeesSenator PughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsFinance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0663
    (HB0900)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest HouseSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2014 - 9:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0680
    (HB1500)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Epiphany House and Micah House ProjectsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0702
    (HB0395)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Senator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1014
    (HB1380)
Developmental Disabilities - Residential Programs - Reimbursement for Visitation Absence DaysSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1109
    (HB1550)
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Cedar Lane Senior Living Community Project - Phase 4Senator DysonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.