Assisted Living

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0186 / CH0317Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - EstablishmentChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Health and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0244Assisted Living Programs - Closure or Change of Location or Ownership - Resident and Resident Representative NotificationDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0362Department of Veterans Affairs - Study of Solar Photovoltaic System - Charlotte Hall Veterans HomeDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0437 / CH0147
    (SB0537)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0456
    (SB0382)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0588Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0650
    (SB0609)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0902
    (SB0443)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest HouseDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0960 / CH0439
    (SB0853 / CH0438)
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and AccountsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1296Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service RequirementDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1476 / CH0699
    (SB0797 / CH0698)
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated FundingDelegate JalisiEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0382
    (HB0456)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0418
    (HB0404)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0443
    (HB0902)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest HouseSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0537
    (HB0437 / CH0147)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0609
    (HB0650)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0797 / CH0698
    (HB1476 / CH0699)
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated FundingSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 698Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0853 / CH0438
    (HB0960 / CH0439)
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.