Associations

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0041Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and VolunteersDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0058 / CH0219Health Occupations - Members of Boards and Advisory Committees - Prohibition Against Concurrent ServiceDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 219Health and Government Operations
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0219Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and ReportingDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0311
    (SB0704)
Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX LicensesDelegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0407
    (SB0123)
Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School ScheduleDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0452 / CH0421
    (SB0497)
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public SchoolsDelegate EbersoleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0527 / CH0092Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency RequirementsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0550State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0561 / CH0433State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Notice of Member VacanciesDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Health and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0617 / CH0264Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs PG 307-15Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 264Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0710Prince George's County - School Property - Development of Policy for Noneducational Use PG 406-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0739
    (SB0074 / CH0006)
Task Force to Study Maternal Mental HealthDelegate KellyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1061
    (SB0300)
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1084
    (SB0581)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence CommissionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1176Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit ProgramsDelegate KnottsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
SB0074 / CH0006
    (HB0739)
Task Force to Study Maternal Mental HealthSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Finance
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0123
    (HB0407)
Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School ScheduleSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0187 / CH0329Workgroup to Study Access to Obstetric ServicesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0300
    (HB1061)
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0493Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of MarylandSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0497
    (HB0452 / CH0421)
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public SchoolsSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0548Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0581
    (HB1084)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence CommissionSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0704
    (HB0311)
Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX LicensesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0866Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle ClubsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0901Standardbred Racing - Purse Deductions and Operating Assistance to Rosecroft RacewaySenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesGaming (C7)
SB0911Comptroller - Special Event Liquor PermitSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0929 / CH0213Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit ProgramsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 213Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.