Associations

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018
    (SB0993)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealDelegate ClarkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0490
    (SB0163 / CH0441)
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and CertificationDelegate LamIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0623
    (SB0164)
Education - Student Use of Backpacks - Assessment and Reduction of Health EffectsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0666Health Insurance - Associations - DefinitionsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0873
    (SB0659 / CH0720)
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of StockDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEconomic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1286
    (SB0614)
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and ProcessDelegate GlennIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1320 / CH0097
    (SB0322 / CH0098)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem LicensesDelegate CordermanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 97Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1388
    (SB0597)
Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant ProgramDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0009 / CH0044Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - RepealChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0163 / CH0441
    (HB0490)
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and CertificationSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0164
    (HB0623)
Education - Student Use of Backpacks - Assessment and Reduction of Health EffectsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0322 / CH0098
    (HB1320 / CH0097)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem LicensesWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0597
    (HB1388)
Community Colleges – Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant ProgramSenator KingIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0614
    (HB1286)
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and ProcessSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0659 / CH0720
    (HB0873)
Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of StockSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 720Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0993
    (HB0018)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:34 A.M.