Attachments and Garnishments

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0895
    (SB0655)
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support PaymentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
HB1435
    (SB0725)
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body AttachmentDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0512Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal PropertySenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0655
    (HB0895)
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support PaymentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
SB0725
    (HB1435)
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body AttachmentSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0950Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - ExemptionsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.