Attorneys

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0129
    (SB0262 / CH0035)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0278
    (SB0265 / CH0037)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0346 / CH0031
    (SB0216 / CH0030)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0377Criminal Procedure - Court Order - Location of Mobile Communications DeviceDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0489 / CH0373
    (SB0504)
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - ExpansionDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0509Maryland False Claims Act of 2013Delegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0786 / CH0639Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court JurisdictionDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0952
    (SB0782)
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - Legal CounselDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0961State Government - Maryland Public Information Act - Required Denials Regarding Firearm Dealers, Owners, and Permit HoldersDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1006Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:55 (Senator Brochin) Adopted (28-19) Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1132 / CH0074
    (SB0749 / CH0073)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational ChangesDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1382Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Delegate McDermottIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1481
    (SB0557 / CH0287)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0216 / CH0030
    (HB0346 / CH0031)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0262 / CH0035
    (HB0129)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0265 / CH0037
    (HB0278)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0504
    (HB0489 / CH0373)
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - ExpansionSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0557 / CH0287
    (HB1481)
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory ProcessSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0637Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0648Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and DetentionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0701Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0749 / CH0073
    (HB1132 / CH0074)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational ChangesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 73Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0985Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Public Nuisance SuitsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.