Attorneys

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0029
    (SB0554)
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust ActDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0181
    (SB0040 / CH0008)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0236
    (SB0208)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0239
    (SB0540)
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit CardDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0399 / CH0398Public Health - Medical Records Charges - Medicaid EnrolleesDelegate MurphyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Health and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0767
    (SB0831)
Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient TreatmentDelegate MurphyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0831 / CH0347
    (SB0846 / CH0346)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Delegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0857Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit CourtsDelegate SmigielIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0867Maryland False Claims ActDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0985Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for ServicesDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1052
    (SB0805 / CH0342)
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law ActDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1225
    (SB0886 / CH0354)
Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland - Conservatorship and TransferDelegate RosenbergVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1245
    (SB0922 / CH0205)
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic NotificationDelegate Valentino-SmithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1270
    (SB0914)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1274Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Safety (E4)
HB1304Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Interrogation Right to Counsel - Suspension Period and AppointmentDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0040 / CH0008
    (HB0181)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0208
    (HB0236)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Family Law (D4)
SB0375Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0438 / CH0501Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State BallotSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
SB0540
    (HB0239)
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit CardSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0554
    (HB0029)
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust ActSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0681Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0805 / CH0342
    (HB1052)
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0826Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - Legal CounselSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
SB0831
    (HB0767)
Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient TreatmentSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0846 / CH0346
    (HB0831 / CH0347)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Senator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0886 / CH0354
    (HB1225)
Legal Mutual Liability Insurance Society of Maryland - Conservatorship and TransferSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0914
    (HB1270)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0922 / CH0205
    (HB1245)
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic NotificationSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0931State Board of Elections - Provision of Professional Legal AssistanceSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1090Prince George's County - Circuit Court - Attorney Appearance FeePrince George's County SenatorsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1093State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.